|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 705, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. (Corrected August 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 5365.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 6008.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 4. Page 2963.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2934.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2016
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
January 19 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2016
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2895.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U., & C. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2886.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2016
|
Set for hearing January 13 in E., U., & C. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2016
|
Set for hearing January 12 in T. & H. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 418.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|