California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB247 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 11, 2016
Bill June 8, 2016
Bill May 26, 2016
Bill January 26, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015