LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB247
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB247
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB247
Compare Versions
SB247 Chaptered September 27, 2016
SB247 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB247 Amended August 11, 2016
SB247 Amended June 8, 2016
SB247 Amended May 26, 2016
SB247 Amended January 26, 2016
SB247 Amended January 4, 2016
SB247 Amended July 16, 2015
SB247 Amended April 7, 2015
SB247 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB247 Chaptered September 27, 2016
SB247 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB247 Amended August 11, 2016
SB247 Amended June 8, 2016
SB247 Amended May 26, 2016
SB247 Amended January 26, 2016
SB247 Amended January 4, 2016
SB247 Amended July 16, 2015
SB247 Amended April 7, 2015
SB247 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare