|
09/30/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 384, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2442.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2796.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2015
|
August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10))
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
July 1 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1297.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1150.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 418.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|