California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB252 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill August 28, 2015
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015