LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB252
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB252
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB252
Compare Versions
SB252 Chaptered September 30, 2015
SB252 Enrolled September 4, 2015
SB252 Amended August 28, 2015
SB252 Amended August 18, 2015
SB252 Amended June 2, 2015
SB252 Amended April 7, 2015
SB252 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB252 Chaptered September 30, 2015
SB252 Enrolled September 4, 2015
SB252 Amended August 28, 2015
SB252 Amended August 18, 2015
SB252 Amended June 2, 2015
SB252 Amended April 7, 2015
SB252 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare