|
05/10/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3661.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4465.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2015
|
June 16 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 742.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|