LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB269
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB269
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB269
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 19, 2015
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 26, 2016
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
May 10, 2016
Compare
Amended
Bill
January 25, 2016
Compare
Bill
January 11, 2016
Compare
Bill
April 6, 2015
Compare