LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB269
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB269
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB269
Compare Versions
SB269 Chaptered May 10, 2016
SB269 Enrolled April 26, 2016
SB269 Amended January 25, 2016
SB269 Amended January 11, 2016
SB269 Amended April 6, 2015
SB269 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB269 Chaptered May 10, 2016
SB269 Enrolled April 26, 2016
SB269 Amended January 25, 2016
SB269 Amended January 11, 2016
SB269 Amended April 6, 2015
SB269 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare