|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 758, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2775.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 6. Page 3185.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 17)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 1250.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1146.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 698.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|