California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB27 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill September 10, 2015
Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 14, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015