LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB27
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB27
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB27
Compare Versions
SB27 Chaptered October 10, 2015
SB27 Enrolled September 16, 2015
SB27 Amended September 10, 2015
SB27 Amended September 4, 2015
SB27 Amended August 31, 2015
SB27 Amended August 17, 2015
SB27 Amended July 14, 2015
SB27 Amended July 8, 2015
SB27 Amended June 25, 2015
SB27 Amended June 1, 2015
SB27 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB27 Chaptered October 10, 2015
SB27 Enrolled September 16, 2015
SB27 Amended September 10, 2015
SB27 Amended September 4, 2015
SB27 Amended August 31, 2015
SB27 Amended August 17, 2015
SB27 Amended July 14, 2015
SB27 Amended July 8, 2015
SB27 Amended June 25, 2015
SB27 Amended June 1, 2015
SB27 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare