|
10/02/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 449, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2271.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2631.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 3. Page 1097.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 982.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 651.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|