LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB287
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB287
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB287
Compare Versions
SB287 Chaptered October 2, 2015
SB287 Enrolled August 31, 2015
SB287 Amended July 16, 2015
SB287 Amended July 8, 2015
SB287 Amended June 23, 2015
SB287 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB287 Chaptered October 2, 2015
SB287 Enrolled August 31, 2015
SB287 Amended July 16, 2015
SB287 Amended July 8, 2015
SB287 Amended June 23, 2015
SB287 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare