California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB287 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2015

Amended

Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015
Bill June 23, 2015