|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 607, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2683.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 2488.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Set for hearing September 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2390.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 2724.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2015
|
August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 15). (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10))
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 2348.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 2348.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1074.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1033.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 919.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
April 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|