California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB295 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill August 19, 2015
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill June 24, 2015