LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB295
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB295
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB295
Compare Versions
SB295 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB295 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB295 Amended August 19, 2015
SB295 Amended August 18, 2015
SB295 Amended June 24, 2015
SB295 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB295 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB295 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB295 Amended August 19, 2015
SB295 Amended August 18, 2015
SB295 Amended June 24, 2015
SB295 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare