|
09/08/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 249, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5338.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 31. Page 6083.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 44. Noes 21. Page 5986.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 43. Noes 29. Page 3034.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 30. Noes 35. Page 2975.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Ridley-Thomas.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 2896.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1285.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1146.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 857.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|