California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB32 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 8, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 10, 2016
Bill September 10, 2015
Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill March 16, 2015