LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB32
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB32
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB32
Compare Versions
SB32 Chaptered September 8, 2016
SB32 Enrolled August 25, 2016
SB32 Amended August 19, 2016
SB32 Amended June 30, 2016
SB32 Amended June 10, 2016
SB32 Amended September 10, 2015
SB32 Amended September 4, 2015
SB32 Amended August 31, 2015
SB32 Amended June 1, 2015
SB32 Amended May 5, 2015
SB32 Amended March 16, 2015
SB32 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB32 Chaptered September 8, 2016
SB32 Enrolled August 25, 2016
SB32 Amended August 19, 2016
SB32 Amended June 30, 2016
SB32 Amended June 10, 2016
SB32 Amended September 10, 2015
SB32 Amended September 4, 2015
SB32 Amended August 31, 2015
SB32 Amended June 1, 2015
SB32 Amended May 5, 2015
SB32 Amended March 16, 2015
SB32 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare