|
09/01/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 230, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2047.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2431.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 532.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 218.) (February 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
Set for hearing February 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|