California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB35 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2015

Amended

Bill June 16, 2015
Bill March 4, 2015