LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB35
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB35
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB35
Compare Versions
SB35 Chaptered September 1, 2015
SB35 Enrolled August 19, 2015
SB35 Amended June 16, 2015
SB35 Amended March 4, 2015
SB35 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB35 Chaptered September 1, 2015
SB35 Enrolled August 19, 2015
SB35 Amended June 16, 2015
SB35 Amended March 4, 2015
SB35 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare