|
10/07/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 547, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2782.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 3187.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. (Corrected September 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 41. Noes 27. Page 2925.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1284.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1152.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 857.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 508.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|