California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB350 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2015

Amended

Bill September 11, 2015
Bill September 4, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015