LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB350
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB350
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB350
Compare Versions
SB350 Chaptered October 7, 2015
SB350 Amended September 11, 2015
SB350 Enrolled September 11, 2015
SB350 Amended September 4, 2015
SB350 Amended July 16, 2015
SB350 Amended July 8, 2015
SB350 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB350 Chaptered October 7, 2015
SB350 Amended September 11, 2015
SB350 Enrolled September 11, 2015
SB350 Amended September 4, 2015
SB350 Amended July 16, 2015
SB350 Amended July 8, 2015
SB350 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare