|
09/16/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 391, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5492.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 5437.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Set for hearing August 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5326.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6089.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cooper. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and W., P., & W. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 16). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 631.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 405.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|