California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB37 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 4, 2016
Bill June 29, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 7, 2016
Bill February 12, 2015