LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB37
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB37
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB37
Compare Versions
SB37 Chaptered September 16, 2016
SB37 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB37 Amended August 18, 2016
SB37 Amended August 4, 2016
SB37 Amended June 29, 2016
SB37 Amended June 21, 2016
SB37 Amended May 31, 2016
SB37 Amended March 7, 2016
SB37 Amended February 12, 2015
SB37 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB37 Chaptered September 16, 2016
SB37 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB37 Amended August 18, 2016
SB37 Amended August 4, 2016
SB37 Amended June 29, 2016
SB37 Amended June 21, 2016
SB37 Amended May 31, 2016
SB37 Amended March 7, 2016
SB37 Amended February 12, 2015
SB37 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare