LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB380
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB380
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB380
Action History
Senate
01/28/2016
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2981.) (January 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Senate
01/28/2016
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
Senate
01/27/2016
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
03/05/2015
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
02/25/2015
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
Senate
02/24/2015
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.