LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB380
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB380
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB380
Compare Versions
SB380 Chaptered May 10, 2016
SB380 Enrolled May 3, 2016
SB380 Amended April 19, 2016
SB380 Amended March 30, 2016
SB380 Amended March 7, 2016
SB380 Amended February 16, 2016
SB380 Amended January 27, 2016
SB380 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB380 Chaptered May 10, 2016
SB380 Enrolled May 3, 2016
SB380 Amended April 19, 2016
SB380 Amended March 30, 2016
SB380 Amended March 7, 2016
SB380 Amended February 16, 2016
SB380 Amended January 27, 2016
SB380 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare