California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB380 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2016

Chaptered

Bill May 10, 2016

Amended

Bill April 19, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016
Bill March 7, 2016
Bill February 16, 2016
Bill January 27, 2016