|
09/30/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 385, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2750.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3031.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 1254.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1153.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
May 11 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 822.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|