California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB405 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 27, 2015
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 7, 2015
Bill June 24, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015