LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB405
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB405
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB405
Compare Versions
SB405 Chaptered September 30, 2015
SB405 Enrolled September 15, 2015
SB405 Amended September 4, 2015
SB405 Amended August 27, 2015
SB405 Amended August 17, 2015
SB405 Amended July 7, 2015
SB405 Amended June 24, 2015
SB405 Amended June 1, 2015
SB405 Amended April 6, 2015
SB405 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB405 Chaptered September 30, 2015
SB405 Enrolled September 15, 2015
SB405 Amended September 4, 2015
SB405 Amended August 27, 2015
SB405 Amended August 17, 2015
SB405 Amended July 7, 2015
SB405 Amended June 24, 2015
SB405 Amended June 1, 2015
SB405 Amended April 6, 2015
SB405 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare