|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 16. Page 2775.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 30. Page 3186.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 16. Page 1327.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1153.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 728.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|