LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB406
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB406
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB406
Compare Versions
SB406 Enrolled September 16, 2015
SB406 Amended September 4, 2015
SB406 Amended September 2, 2015
SB406 Amended June 1, 2015
SB406 Amended April 23, 2015
SB406 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB406 Enrolled September 16, 2015
SB406 Amended September 4, 2015
SB406 Amended September 2, 2015
SB406 Amended June 1, 2015
SB406 Amended April 23, 2015
SB406 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare