California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB406 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill September 2, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015