|
09/21/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 436, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5509.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 5456.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Set for hearing August 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5326.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6099.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5966.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
July 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
June 23 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 954.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 885.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
April 27 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
April 20 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|