California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB412 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill June 8, 2016