LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB412
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB412
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB412
Compare Versions
SB412 Chaptered September 21, 2016
SB412 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB412 Amended August 19, 2016
SB412 Amended August 15, 2016
SB412 Amended August 1, 2016
SB412 Amended June 23, 2016
SB412 Amended June 8, 2016
SB412 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB412 Chaptered September 21, 2016
SB412 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB412 Amended August 19, 2016
SB412 Amended August 15, 2016
SB412 Amended August 1, 2016
SB412 Amended June 23, 2016
SB412 Amended June 8, 2016
SB412 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare