|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 771, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5428.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 5916.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2364.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2216.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2015
|
Set for hearing August 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
August 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/23/2015
|
Set for hearing August 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2012.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Set for hearing July 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
June 17 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Set for hearing June 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|