California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB423 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill July 6, 2015
Bill June 3, 2015