LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB423
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB423
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB423
Compare Versions
SB423 Chaptered September 28, 2016
SB423 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB423 Amended August 15, 2016
SB423 Amended August 1, 2016
SB423 Amended June 30, 2016
SB423 Amended June 21, 2016
SB423 Amended August 31, 2015
SB423 Amended July 6, 2015
SB423 Amended June 3, 2015
SB423 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB423 Chaptered September 28, 2016
SB423 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB423 Amended August 15, 2016
SB423 Amended August 1, 2016
SB423 Amended June 30, 2016
SB423 Amended June 21, 2016
SB423 Amended August 31, 2015
SB423 Amended July 6, 2015
SB423 Amended June 3, 2015
SB423 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare