|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 734, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2497.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 2856.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 1023.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 960.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
May 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 723.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|