LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB439
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB439
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB439
Compare Versions
SB439 Chaptered October 10, 2015
SB439 Enrolled September 8, 2015
SB439 Amended August 31, 2015
SB439 Amended June 11, 2015
SB439 Amended April 15, 2015
SB439 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB439 Chaptered October 10, 2015
SB439 Enrolled September 8, 2015
SB439 Amended August 31, 2015
SB439 Amended June 11, 2015
SB439 Amended April 15, 2015
SB439 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare