California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB439 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 11, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015