|
09/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 477, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5112.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5077.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Set for hearing August 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4954.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5777.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2015
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 2972.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1189.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1153.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 815.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|