LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB441
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB441
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB441
Compare Versions
SB441 Chaptered September 22, 2016
SB441 Enrolled August 19, 2016
SB441 Amended June 22, 2016
SB441 Amended June 9, 2016
SB441 Amended April 6, 2015
SB441 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB441 Chaptered September 22, 2016
SB441 Enrolled August 19, 2016
SB441 Amended June 22, 2016
SB441 Amended June 9, 2016
SB441 Amended April 6, 2015
SB441 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare